IL SB3166 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Video Gaming Act. Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board may grant licenses to permit video gaming in a licensed veterans establishment within a municipality or unincorporated area of a county that has prohibited video gaming. Effective immediately.
Title
VIDEO GAMING-VETERANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-02 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-005-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 13, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Gaming; 012-001-001 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Gaming |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 40 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |