IL SB3160 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that upon notice of suspension of a person's driver's license, the Secretary of State shall give the person an option to complete a driver education program within 45 days of notice. Provides that upon completion of the program and providing the Secretary with necessary documentation, the person's driver's license suspension shall terminate if the person does not commit a similar driving offense within 6 months of the notice.
Title
VEH CD-DRIVER EDU PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 6-205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |