IL SB3157 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that each qualified teacher is entitled to an income tax credit in an aggregate amount equal to 50% of the tuition costs incurred by that teacher at a public university in the State. Provides that each qualified teacher may take no more than 20% of his or her aggregate credit amount in any taxable year. Provides that the term "qualified teacher" means an individual who (i) graduated from a public university in the State, (ii) is employed as a teacher in this State during the taxable year, and (iii) has been employed as a teacher in the State for at least 5 consecutive years as of the first day of the taxable year. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EDUCATION CREDIT
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |