IL SB3157 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0958
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grade A Pasteurized Milk and Milk Products Act. Deletes definitions for "dairy farm" and "milk product". Deletes provisions that (1) establish testing protocols and (2) set forth a violation of the Act. Provides instead that the Department or a unit of local government electing to administer and enforce the Act has the responsibility to prevent the distribution of adulterated milk and milk products and to inform the public of adulterated milk and milk products already in commerce. Provides that in response to a confirmed foodborne outbreak or when a high risk of infection exists, the enforcing agency shall require pathogen testing to be performed on the implicated milk and milk products. Specifies that sample collection, examination standards, and enforcement with regard to the testing shall be conducted in accordance with the rules adopted under the Act and the Grade A Pasteurized Milk Ordinance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MILK PRODUCTS ACT-ENFORCEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-20 - House of Representatives - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-15SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0958
2014-08-15SenateEffective Date January 1, 2015
2014-08-15SenateGovernor Approved
2014-06-18SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-20SenatePassed Both Houses
2014-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2014-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-05-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
2014-04-29HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino
2014-04-23HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2014-04-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-04-01HouseFirst Reading
2014-04-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2014-04-01HouseArrived in House
2014-04-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2014-03-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014
2014-03-27SenateSecond Reading
2014-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2014
2014-03-20SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2014-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2014-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2014-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2014-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2014-03-05SenatePostponed - Public Health
2014-02-26SenatePostponed - Public Health
2014-02-19SenateAssigned to Public Health
2014-02-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-02-11SenateFirst Reading
2014-02-11SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41063510Amended CodeCitation Text
4106353Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback