IL SB3154 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code and the Wildlife Code. Provides that the current fees for a fishing license, sportsmen's combination license, and hunting license are annual fees. Allows a resident to obtain a 3-year fishing license (for a fee of $45), sportsmen's combination license (for a fee of $78.75), or hunting license (for a fee of $37.50). Provides that there is no fee for an annual or 3-year fishing license, sportsmen's combination license, or hunting license for a resident Gold Star Family member. Effective immediately.
Title
FISH/HUNT LICENSE FEES
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] |
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
515 | 5 | 20-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3154&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3154.htm |