IL SB3151 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
Pending: House Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:00 am in Room 114
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Courses of Study Article of the School Code. In provisions concerning safety education and driver education courses, provides that the course instruction on special hazards existing at and required safety and driving precautions that must be observed at highway construction and maintenance zones shall include worker safety in highway construction and maintenance zones. Effective August 1, 2024.
Title
SCH CD-DRIVER ED-WORKER SAFETY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 010-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-24.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |