IL SB3144 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0827
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Right to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Act. Establishes the Task Force on Counsel in Immigration Proceedings. Provides for members, compensation, and support staff. Provides that the Task Force shall investigate the implementation of universal representation for covered individuals in immigration removal proceedings. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report of its findings in the investigation and its recommendations for how to fully provide legal representation for covered individuals facing immigration proceedings no later than July 1, 2023. Repeals the Act July 1, 2024. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMMIGRATION-RIGHT TO COUNSEL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0827
2022-05-13SenateEffective Date May 13, 2022
2022-05-13SenateGovernor Approved
2022-04-28SenateSent to the Governor
2022-04-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2022-04-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2022-03-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2022-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2022-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2022-03-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado
2022-03-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2022-03-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-027-000
2022-03-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2022-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2022-03-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2022-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2022-03-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2022-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2022-03-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 008-000-000
2022-03-07HouseAssigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee
2022-02-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2022-02-23HouseFirst Reading
2022-02-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2022-02-23HouseArrived in House
2022-02-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-016-000
2022-02-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022
2022-02-10SenateSecond Reading
2022-02-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
2022-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022
2022-02-07SenateDo Pass Human Rights; 006-003-000
2022-01-26SenateAssigned to Human Rights
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2022-01-12SenateFirst Reading
2022-01-12SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback