IL SB3135 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency may not require an individual to obtain a permit in order to apply algicide, copper sulfate, copper sulfate based products, or copper sulfate chemical aids to a privately held water retention pond, provided that the products are commercially available at retail outlets and are not prohibited by federal law.
Title
EPA-ALGICIDE PERMITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0802 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 015-001-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |