IL SB3121 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. For the purpose of calculating the sales factor when allocating business income of persons other than residents, removes provisions providing that the sale is in this State if the property is shipped from an office, store, warehouse, factory or other place of storage in this State and the purchaser is not taxable in the State of the purchaser. Removes provisions concerning purchasers who are doing business on a premises owned or leased by a person who has independently contracted with the seller for the printing of newspapers, periodicals or books. Removes provisions providing that sales of tangible personal property are not in this State if the seller and purchaser would be members of the same unitary business group but for the fact that either the seller or purchaser is a person with 80% or more of total business activity outside of the United States and the property is purchased for resale.
Title
INC TX-SALES FACTOR
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3121&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3121.htm |