IL SB3118 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1347
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1347
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority (the Authority) has the power to employ and discharge, subject to (rather than without regard to) the requirements of any civil service or personnel Act. Creates the Office of the Toll Highway Inspector General under the direction and supervision of the Toll Highway Inspector General (Inspector General) as a fully independent office with separate appropriations. Provides that the Governor shall appoint the Inspector General, and provides for appointment procedures and the minimum qualifications for the Inspector General. Contains provisions concerning the term, filling vacancies, compensation, ethics, and removal of the Inspector General. Provides that the Inspector General shall have jurisdiction over the Authority and all officers and employees of, and vendors and others doing business with, State agencies within the jurisdiction of the Authority. Provides that subject to a person's privilege against self-incrimination, any person who fails to appear in response to a subpoena, answer any question, or produce any books or papers pertinent to an investigation or who knowingly gives false testimony in relation to an investigation by the Inspector General is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that the annual budget for the Inspector General shall be set to 0.5% of the Authority's total revenue for the immediately preceding fiscal year.
Title
TOLL HWY ACT-INSPECTOR GENERAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-28 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1347 | |
2010-07-28 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-28 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 048-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 3, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2010-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-04-30 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-04-30 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-003-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-04-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-04-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-22 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Tollway Oversight Committee; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Tollway Oversight Committee | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-03-12 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 | |
2010-03-12 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-03-09 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-03-08 | Postponed - Executive | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-02-08 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-08 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |