IL SB3116 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08SenateSession Sine Die
2012-05-02SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2012-03-30SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012
2012-03-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2012
2012-03-22SenateSecond Reading
2012-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012
2012-03-08SenateDo Pass Executive; 012-000-000
2012-03-01SenateAssigned to Executive
2012-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2012-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5801Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback