IL SB3115 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Currency Exchange Act. Requires that an applicant for a license to operate a currency exchange must provide a statement that the business is in good standing with the State of Illinois and in compliance with the Department of Revenue. Repeals a provision that allows community currency exchanges and ambulatory currency exchanges to engage in distribution of Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits and a provision that prohibits community currency exchanges and ambulatory currency exchanges from issuing tokens to be used instead of money for the purchase of goods or services from any enterprise.
Title
CURRENCY EXCHANGE ACT-LICENSES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 009-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 405 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 405 | 3.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 405 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3115&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB3115.htm |