IL SB3102 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-30 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in cases involving the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act, restitution shall be ordered for any United States Currency Official Advanced Funds (OAF) expended by law enforcement officers or task force members to purchase the cannabis, controlled substances, or methamphetamine or substance to produce or manufacture, or both, methamphetamine. Provides that restitution shall include not only United States currency that was used in the offense charged, but any currency that was previously used in the investigation leading to the arrest and subsequent conviction. Provides that restitution shall be awarded only to the law enforcement agency or task force responsible for the expenditure of United States currency. Provides that restitution shall not exceed the actual amount expended, minus any OAF recovered, by the law enforcement agency or task force during the investigation. Provides that restitution shall be in addition to any other fine, fee, or cost authorized by law. Provides that restitution shall apply to any agreed or contested sentence and may be submitted to the court by way of affidavit setting forth the amount of restitution requested, the name of the defendant, and the name of the law enforcement agency or task force. Provides that bond posted by the defendant may be used for restitution.
Title
CD CORR-OAF RESTITUTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |