IL SB3102 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning appropriations for public graveyards.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60 | 1 | 30-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3102&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3102.htm |