IL SB3084 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that no owner or operator of a landfill within a 25-mile radius of a facility accepting exclusively general construction or demolition debris for transfer, storage, or treatment shall accept whole or processed asphalt roofing shingles for disposal. Requires the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to post on its website the name and address of facilities accepting exclusively general construction or demolition debris for transfer, storage, or treatment. Changes the repeal date for a Section concerning the disposal of asphalt roofing shingles from February 1, 2018 to February 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
ASPHALT ROOFING DISPOSAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 22.54a | Amended Code | Citation Text |