IL SB3071 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Diversifying Higher Education Faculty in Illinois Act. Provides that the Program Board created to administer the grant program authorized by the Act shall be comprised of 11 (rather than 21) members. Effective immediately.
Title
HGHER ED-DIVERSE FACULTY GRANT
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Rooney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Rooney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 930 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3071&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3071.htm |