IL SB3053 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Biometric Information Privacy Act. Provides that nothing in the Act shall be deemed to apply to a private entity collecting, storing, or transmitting biometric information if: (i) the biometric information is used exclusively for employment, human resources, fraud prevention, or security purposes; (ii) the private entity does not sell, lease, trade, or similarly profit from the biometric identifier or biometric information collected; or (iii) the private entity stores, transmits, and protects the biometric identifiers and biometric information in a manner that is the same as or more protective than the manner in which the private entity stores, transmits, and protects other confidential and sensitive information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BIOMETRIC INFO PRIVACY-EXEMPT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenatePostponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-04-23SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-12SenatePostponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7401425Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback