IL SB3049 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-10)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-10)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1033
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Adds the Gray wolf, American black bear, and Cougar to the list of protected species under the Act.
Title
PROTECTION OF WILDLIFE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1033 |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Agriculture and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000 |
2014-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 006-000-002 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |