IL SB3048 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that whenever the Department of Healthcare and Family Services or a managed care organization under contract with the Department authorizes the purchase of durable medical equipment, the Department or managed care organization may require a medical assistance recipient to purchase used or refurbished durable medical equipment, if used or refurbished medical equipment: (i) is available; (ii) is less expensive, including shipping costs, than new durable medical equipment of the same type; (iii) is able to withstand at least 3 years of use; and (iv) equally meets the needs of the recipient. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-DURABLE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1018
2018-08-21SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-21SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3048&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3048.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3048eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3048enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1018.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3048sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3048sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3048sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB3048ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3048_04252018_044000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB3048_05252018_042000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB3048ham001_05302018_038000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback