IL SB3046 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, eligible TRS benefit recipients, TRS dependent beneficiaries, community college benefit recipients, and community college dependent beneficiaries may elect not to participate in the program of health benefits under the Act. Provides that the election must be made during the benefit recipient's annual open enrollment period, subject to specified conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE INSURANCE-ENROLLMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1017 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Effective Date August 21, 2018 |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-011-002 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 375 | 6.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |