IL SB3045 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Provides that, if for any reason the General Assembly fails to make appropriations of amounts sufficient from the State Lottery Fund to the Department for payment of prizes to holders of winning lottery tickets or shares, including prizes related to Multi-State Lottery games, and payment of promotional or incentive prizes associated with the sale of lottery tickets, then the provision constitutes an irrevocable and continuing appropriation of all amounts necessary for that purpose, and the irrevocable and continuing authority for and direction to the Comptroller and to the Treasurer of the State to make the necessary transfers out of and disbursements from the State Lottery Fund for that purpose. Specifies that the revenues received from the sale of lottery tickets or shares is net of, among other things, sales agent commissions (rather than commissions) and any private manager compensation or reimbursements due under the management agreement. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-CONTINUING APPROP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3045&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB3045.htm |