IL SB3012 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the county board may designate a geographic area within the county as a flood zone. Provides that homestead property that is located within a flood zone is entitled to a reduction of $5,000 from the property's equalized assessed value for the tax year in which the area is designated as a flood zone.
Title
PROP TX-FLOODING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |