IL SB2998 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to State assessments, provides that the State Board of Education shall develop a process for the college and career ready assessment that allows a school board to apply to the State Board to utilize the nationally recognized and locally selected assessment option of the federal Every Student Succeeds Act. Requires that the State Board of Education adopt technical criteria under specified federal law and rule to evaluate the proposed assessment. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CAREER READY ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.64a-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |