IL SB2995 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Humane Care for Animals Act. Makes changes to the penalties for persons convicted of aggravated cruelty to a companion animal. Provides that a person convicted of causing the death of a companion animal is guilty of a Class 2 felony (rather than a Class 4 felony). Provides that a second or subsequent conviction for an act that causes the death of a companion animal is a Class 1 felony (rather than a Class 3 felony).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMALS-CRUELTY-PENALTIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2020-03-18SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure
2020-02-25SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2020-02-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2020-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2020-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2020-02-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2020-02-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2020-02-11SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2020-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2020-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Assignments
2020-02-05SenateFirst Reading
2020-02-05SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
510703.02Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback