IL SB2992 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Includes disabled persons within the provisions granting an assessment freeze homestead exemption to senior citizens. Changes the name to the Senior Citizens and Disabled Persons Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption (now Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TAX FREEZE-DISABLED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Boland | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carole Pankau |