IL SB2989 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, a county with a population of less than 3,000,000 does not have to comply with the changes made by Public Act 100-1 (the Bail Reform Act of 2017) if the county board adopts a resolution for that purpose on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
BAIL REFORM OPT OUT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2989&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2989.htm |