IL SB2976 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that a person licensed to make wine under the laws of another state who has a winery shipper's license and annually produces less than 250,000 gallons (instead of 25,000 gallons) of wine or a person who has a first-class or second-class wine manufacturer's license, a first-class or second-class wine-maker's license, or a limited wine manufacturer's license and annually produces less than 250,000 gallons (instead of 25,000 gallons) of wine may make application to the Illinois Liquor Control Commission for a self-distribution exemption to allow the sale of not more than 50,000 gallons (instead of 5,000 gallons) of the exemption holder's wine to retail licensees per year. Makes conforming changes. Removes language providing that a first-class wine-maker holding a class 1 brewer license or a class 1 craft distiller license shall not be eligible for a wine-maker's premises license but shall be permitted to sell wine manufactured at the first-class wine-maker premises to non-licensees. Makes changes to licensing fees for first-class wine manufacturers and first-class wine makers. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-WINE MANUFACTURERS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Executive- Liquor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 3-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2976&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2976.htm |