IL SB2968 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Provides that reports issued under the provisions shall be issued by October 31 of each year (rather than September 30 of each year). Provides that the Department of Human Services, under the direction of the Office of the Governor, shall establish, by rule, demographic classifications for each reporting category, including race and ethnicity, age, sex, disability status, sexual orientation, gender identity, and primary or preferred language. Provides that the project implementation team shall include a representative from the Department of Human Services. Removes a provision concerning programs administered by the State Board of Education or specified Departments that serves and collects data from individuals younger than 18 years old or adults who are receiving services due to having been victims of domestic violence. Makes other changes.
Title
DEMOGRAPHIC DATA COLLECTION
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Edgar Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Yolanda Morris [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-038-000 |
2024-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-001-000 |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2024-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-13 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2024-05-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-05-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-05-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Rights; 006-002-000 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Rights |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Human Rights |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Human Rights |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 65 | 20-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |