IL SB2968 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act. Provides that the State Treasurer may allow an eligible financial institution (rather than a bank or savings and loan association) to become a State depository. Provides that State depositories may submit proposals or applications that may be approved or rejected by the State Treasurer. Provides that the State Treasurer may accept a proposal from an eligible financial institution which provides for a reduced rate of interest provided that the financial institution documents the use of deposited funds for specified economic development projects (currently, economic community development projects). Removes provisions concerning proposals for a reduced rate of interest with moneys to be expended for specified purposes. Modifies provisions concerning proposals from an eligible financial institution that provides for interest earnings on deposits of State moneys to be held by the financial institution in a separate account that the State Treasurer may use to secure up to 10% of any specified home loan to Illinois citizens. Modifies provisions concerning permitted investments. Allows the State Treasurer to make specified investments without the approval of the Governor. Expands the items upon which the State Treasurer may invest State moneys. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ST MONEY-DEPOSIT & INVESTMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 520 | 22.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 520 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |