IL SB2966 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Re-creates the Comprehensive Regional Planning Fund. Provides a continuing appropriation of $5,000,000 adjusted for inflation from the General Revenue Fund to the Fund. Directs the Department of Transportation to annually distribute moneys received in the Fund without appropriation according to a specified formula. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPREHENSIVE REG PLAN-FUND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |