IL SB2963 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that traps used in the taking of mammals protected by the Code, for which an open trapping season has been established, shall be marked or tagged with metal tags or inscribed in lettering giving the name and address of the owner, or the name and customer identification number issued by the Department of Natural Resources, and absence of such mark or tag shall be prima facie evidence that such trap or traps are illegally used and the trap or traps shall be confiscated and disposed of as directed by the Department. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-TRAPPING TAGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52053.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback