IL SB2962 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the community spouse resource allowance to be established and maintained at the maximum amount permitted under a specified provision of the Social Security Act, or an amount set after a fair hearing, or the amount transferred by the institutionalized spouse to the community spouse by court order, whichever is greater (rather than requiring the community spouse resource allowance to be established and maintained at the higher of $109,560 or the minimum level permitted under the Social Security Act, or an amount set after a fair hearing, whichever is greater). Requires the monthly maintenance allowance for the community spouse to be established and maintained at the maximum amount permitted under a specified provision of the Social Security Act, or an amount set after a fair hearing, or the amount transferred by the institutionalized spouse to the community spouse by court order, whichever is greater (rather than requiring the monthly maintenance allowance for the community spouse to be established and maintained at the higher of $2,739 per month or the minimum level permitted under the Social Security Act, or an amount set after a fair hearing, whichever is greater).
Title
MEDICAID-COMMUNITY SPOUSE
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Anna Moeller [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-02-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 013-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 1, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 013-000-000 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-12-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |