IL SB2954 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Optometric Practice Act of 1987. Allows optometrists to employ or engage the services of any optical laboratory, without restriction, to construct, fabricate, manufacture, or repair optical lenses, ophthalmic lenses, other vision corrective lenses, including, but not limited to, progressive lenses and bifocals and trifocals, and prisms. Allows the optical laboratory employed by an optometrist to subcontract with another optical laboratory for all or a portion of the services, with the optometrist's knowledge. Effective January 1, 2017.
Title
OPTICAL LABORATORIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2954&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2954.htm |