IL SB2950 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sanitary District Act of 1917. Provides that, on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, appointments to the board of trustees of the Thorn Creek Basin Sanitary District shall be made as follows: within 30 days of the vacancy being created, the mayor of each municipality located in whole or in part of the District may recommend a candidate or candidates to be appointed to the position of trustee, except, if the vacancy is existing on the effective date of the amendatory Act, recommendations may be made within 30 days of the effective date of the amendatory Act; a majority of the mayors must select an appropriate candidate to be appointed from among those candidates recommended by the mayors; and, in voting for each candidate, a mayor shall be entitled to one vote for every 5,000 residents, or fraction thereof, of the mayor's municipality. Provides that the number of residents for each municipality shall be determined by the most recent federal decennial census.
Title
THORN CREEK BASIN-APPOINTMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2405 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2950&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2950.htm |