IL SB2941 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Authorizes the court to seal Class 4 felony convictions for possession with intent to manufacture or deliver cannabis without the defendant being required to successfully complete qualified probation under the Act. Authorizes the court to seal Class 3 felony convictions for possession with intent to manufacture or deliver cannabis without the defendant being required to obtain an authorization for sealing from the Prisoner Review Board. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM ID SEALING-CANNABIS
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Dunkin [D] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 42 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2014-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 042-069-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 011-004-000 |
2014-05-14 | House | Remains in Judiciary |
2014-05-14 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Judiciary; 008-005-000 |
2014-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-015-000 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |