IL SB2941 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0886
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0886
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Provides that a dentist utilizing dental assistants shall not supervise more than 4 dental assistants at any one time for placing, carving, and finishing of amalgam restorations; the monitoring of nitrous oxide; and pit and fissure sealants. Effective immediately.
Title
DENTAL ASSTS-SUPERVISION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0886 |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date August 2, 2012 |
2012-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-006-000 |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 25 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |