IL SB2939 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. In the definition of "Energy Efficiency Project", includes measures that decrease the heat rate in the generation of electricity. Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. In the definition of "energy efficiency", includes measures that decrease the heat rate in the generation of electricity. Effective immediately.
Title
ENERGY EFFICIENCY MEASURES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this Amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this Amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this Amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 018-000-000 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 825-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |