IL SB2935 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the portion of the salary for the county supervisor of assessments that is paid by the State is no longer subject to appropriation. Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the portion of the salary for state's attorneys, certain assistant state's attorneys, and public defenders that is paid by the State is no longer subject to appropriation. Amends the State Revenue Sharing Act to make conforming changes.
Title
STATES ATTY SALARIES-NO APPROP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 115 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 3-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 3-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-4007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 4-2001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2935&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2935.htm |