IL SB2909 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the Senior Citizens Assessment Freeze Homestead Exemption also applies to qualified first responders. Provides that the term "qualified first responder" means a firefighter or police officer who is at least 50 years of age during the taxable year and receives retirement or disability benefits from his or her service as a firefighter or police officer. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-FIRST RESPONDERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |