IL SB2906 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning the development of an employability plan for recipients of public aid who participate in the Department of Human Services' education, training, and employment program, requires the employability plan to include a description of Core and Non-Core activities the recipient will undertake to achieve his or her employment goal. Requires the Department to define, by rule, the hour requirements regarding Core and Non-Core activities. Provides that Core activities shall consist of employment, participation in the Work First program, vocational training, participation in an associate or bachelor's degree program, and other activities. Provides that Non-Core activities shall consist of job skills training related to employment and education directly related to employment, including, but not limited to: adult basic education and English as a Second Language classes. Provides that high school and high school equivalency programs shall constitute a Core activity for clients when they initially qualify for assistance; however, the Department may define, by rule, when high school and high school equivalency programs may constitute a Non-Core activity for clients who may not finish programs within the time limits of their eligibility.
Title
PUB AID-DHS-EMPLOYMENT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0746 |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Stadelman |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Stadelman |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |