IL SB2902 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Repeals a provision concerning cross-agency master service agreements between State agencies and human service providers. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-CROSS-AGENCY AGREEMENTS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-37a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |