IL SB2897 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Interior Design Title Act. Provides that a registered interior designer shall have a seal or stamp containing his or her name, registration number, and the words "Registered Interior Designer of Illinois". Provides that the registered interior designer shall be responsible for his or her seal and signature. Provides that the seal may be generated by the computer for technical submissions. Provides that the use of a registered interior designer's seal on technical submissions constitutes a representation by the registered interior designer that the work has been prepared by or under the personal supervision of the registered interior designer or developed in conjunction with the use of accepted interior design standards. Provides that it is unlawful to affix one's seal to technical submissions if it masks the true identity of the person who actually exercised direction, control, and supervision of the preparation of work. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
INTERIOR DESIGNER-SEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2897&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2897.htm |