IL SB2890 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that certain Medicaid Facilitation and Utilization payments authorized under the Illinois Administrative Code and initially paid out in State fiscal year 2015 shall remain in effect as long as the annual assessment on inpatient services imposed under the Illinois Public Aid Code is in effect. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-HOSPITAL PAYMENTS
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations I |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 14-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2890&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2890.htm |