IL SB2889 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Epinephrine Administration Act. Provides that a health care practitioner may prescribe epinephrine pre-filled syringes in the name of an authorized entity where allergens capable of causing anaphylaxis may be present. Provides that an authorized entity may acquire and stock a supply of undesignated epinephrine pre-filled syringes provided the undesignated epinephrine pre-filled syringes are stored in a specified location. Requires each employee, agent, or other individual of the authorized entity to complete a specified training program before using a pre-filled syringe to administer epinephrine. Provides that a trained employee, agent, or other individual of the authorized entity may either provide or administer an epinephrine pre-filled syringe to a person whom the employee, agent, or other individual believes in good faith is experiencing anaphylaxis. Provides that training under the Act shall be valid for 2 years. Requires the Department of Public Health to approve training programs, to list the approved programs on the Department's website, and to include links to training providers' websites on the Department's website. Contains provisions concerning costs, limitations, and rulemaking. Defines terms. Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning epinephrine administration, provides that epinephrine may be administered with a pre-filled syringe. Makes conforming changes.
Title
EPINEPHRINE ADMINISTRATION ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. David Harris [R] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0799 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |