IL SB2883 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, on or after July 1, 2018 and on or before December 31, 2019, the taxes imposed under the Acts apply to 80% of the proceeds of sales of mid-range ethanol blends. Defines mid-range ethanol blend. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-GASOHOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2883&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2883.htm |