IL SB2879 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. In a provision concerning investigative reports issued by the Office of the Inspector General upon completion of an abuse or neglect investigation, provides that the victim and the victim's guardian shall be provided with a redacted copy of the investigative report if the allegations of abuse or neglect are substantiated. Provides that unredacted investigative reports, as well as raw data, may be shared with a local law enforcement entity, a State's Attorney's office, or a county coroner's office upon written request. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-INVESTIGATIVE REPORTS
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |