IL SB2876 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code in the provision concerning classes of insurance. Provides that the insurance laws of the State, including the Illinois Insurance Code, do not apply to medical fee sharing arrangements between a religious organization and the organization's members or participants if (1) the organization limits its operations to those activities permitted by the provision concerning medical fee sharing arrangements between a religious organization and the organization's members or participants and (2) the medical fee sharing arrangement and organization meet certain criteria. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-RELIGIOUS ORG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0707 |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 016-000-000 |
2012-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2012 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 009-000-000 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |