IL SB2853 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0883
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0883
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to make available on its website general information on how the Department uses criminal history information in its decisions on licensure applications, including a list of enumerated offenses that bar licensure (rather than requiring the Department to have rules on how a person with criminal history would apply for a non-binding, advisory opinion from the Department as to whether his or her criminal history would bar licensure). Effective immediately.
Title
PROF REG-CRIM HISTORY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0883 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2105 | 2105-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |