IL SB2845 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities and community colleges in Illinois. With respect to employment contracts entered into with the president or all chancellors of a public university or an employee of a community college district, provides that severance under the contract may not exceed 6 months (rather than one year) of salary and applicable benefits.
Title
HIGHER ED-EMPLOYMENT CONTRACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Public Higher Education Administrative Costs, Tuition and Fees |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 520 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 660 | 5-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 665 | 10-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 670 | 15-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 675 | 20-190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 680 | 25-185 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 685 | 30-195 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 690 | 35-190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2845&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2845.htm |