IL SB2844 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish and maintain the Growing Future Educators Program to train high school graduates who at one time have been identified as English learners and who are enrolled in an approved educator preparation program, among other qualifications, to become secondary language educators. Provides that each school district that chooses to participate in the Program shall partner with one public, regionally accredited institution of higher education in this State that offers a pre-approved educator preparation program and each qualified high school graduate participating in the program through the district must be enrolled at that institution in its educator preparation program. Provides that for each semester that a qualified high school graduate is participating in the program, the State Board shall issue the person a paraprofessional educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations and the person must be employed as a part-time employee by the participating district as a paraprofessional working under the supervision of a district employee with a Professional Educator License. Sets forth provisions concerning funding, submitting program data, reporting to the General Assembly, and rulemaking. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-GROWING FUTURE EDUCATOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 008-000-000
2018-05-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-05-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-28HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino
2018-04-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-23SenateSponsor Removed Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
105521B-20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback